Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3599 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13173 Week
» 78127 Month
» 280791 Year
» 3307644 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
714 |
m/e |
11/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9714 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5285 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65285 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 29/11/1963 off Dawsholm (65D) |
Service Life |
67 yrs , 29 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1922 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
11/1922 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 62059, 2248, 64490/91, 5245/85/87, 65290, 5310, 65316, ex L.M.S. Nos. 645, 17267, 17302, 17654. |
SLS/194908 |
17/06/1961 |
Inverurie Works |
Inverurie Works scrap yard contained the following on 17th June-40574/94, 40611/22/88, 43868, 54482/8, 54505, 55198, 56246, 56376, 57232, 57324, 57552/4, 57609, 61784, 62495, 62671, 65285/95, 68459, 69136/43 and awaiting scrapping were 56240 an 65261. A number of these have not yet been withdrawn prior to 8th May! On 24th June extra arrivals were 62474/9 an 55185 whilst 54483 was on Ferryhill en route Inverurie. |
SLS/196107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1896 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 714 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1922 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9714 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5285 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65285 |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
11/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
29/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65285 from Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |
|
|