Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 584 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19495 Week
» 84449 Month
» 287113 Year
» 3313966 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
717 |
m/e |
04/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9717 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5288 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65288 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/06/1967 off Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
4w/e |
07/12/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/06/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1918 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
02/1918 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
12/1943 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
12/1943 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
01/05/1967 |
Last of Scottish steam |
The withdrawal list represents complete withdrawal of all steam locomotives allocated to the Scottish Region, with exception of two J36s, 65288 at Dunfermline and 65345 at Thornton. (65288 is rumoured for private preservation). Final steam allocation was withdrawn from following sheds on dates shown: Carstairs 2nd February, Ferryhill 18th March, St. Margaret's 22nd April, Beattock, Corkerhill, Dundee, Motherwell, Perth and Polmadie 1st May. |
SLS/196706 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1897 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 717 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1918 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1918 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9717 |
|
|
12/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5288 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65288 |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
05/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65288 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |
|
|