Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 36 Online
» 2376 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15782 Week
» 68798 Month
» 188325 Year
» 3215178 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
725 |
m/e |
07/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9725 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5296 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65296 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 26/02/1962 off Eastfield (65A) |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1897 |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
26/02/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1922 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
01/1922 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
06/1947 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
06/1947 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1962 |
Inverurie Works (Cut up) |
In shops-44322/28, 45009, 64572, 64606, 65905. Awaiting shops: 65479. Shopped in previous five weeks-64552/91, 64602/27, 65297. Cut up previous five weeks- 55165/229, 57559, 61996/8, 64542/53, 65296, 68338. Being cut up: 40645/7, 57411, 57557, 64628. Awaiting cut up: 57560, 64566, 64963. 64553 was involved in an accident which resulted in a large 'tear' along the frame and although there was a possibility of repair it was scrapped in the shops. The battery rail-car is back in shops after further trials. |
SLS/196205 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1897 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 725 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1922 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9725 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5296 |
|
|
06/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65296 |
|
|
26/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65296 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|