Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4359 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17765 Week
» 70781 Month
» 190308 Year
» 3217161 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
752 |
m/e |
01/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9752 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5310 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65310 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 01/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 16/07/1962 off Fort William (63B) |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1919 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
12/1919 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
07/1949 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
07/1949 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1961 |
Oban line |
Two NBL D61XX work the 6-05 a.m. Oban-Glasgow, 12 noon Glasgow-Oban, 5-15 p.m. Oban-Glasgow, and 10-30 p.m. Glasgow -Oban ; all other trains are steam worked. 55124 was Oban station pilot on 22nd July; 71000 was noted on Stirling shed on 7th August-it worked the 9-40 a.m. Aberdeen-Glasgow on 30th July. 65310 was also noted at Stirling on 7th August out of use beside stored 57233-officially it is transferred Kittybrewster-St. Rollox. |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 752 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1919 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9752 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5310 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65310 |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (65J) |
|
|
16/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65310 from Fort William (63B) |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|