Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2112 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19915 Week
» 72931 Month
» 192458 Year
» 3219311 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
753 |
m/e |
03/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9753 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5311 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65311 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
06/1955 |
HAIG |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 03/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 29/11/1963 off Polmont (65K) |
Service Life |
64 yrs , 9 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
04/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
02/1926 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1945 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
10/1945 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 753 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
02/1926 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9753 |
|
|
10/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5311 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65311 |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
06/1955 |
Naming |
Named 'HAIG' |
|
|
09/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmont (64E) |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmont (65K) |
|
|
29/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65311 from Polmont (65K) |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|