Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
762 |
m/e |
05/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9762 |
m/e |
07/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5320 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65320 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 30/04/1962 off Parkhead (65C) |
Service Life |
63 yrs |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
30/05/1959 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
07/05/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
11/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
10/1946 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
10/1946 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/04/1952 |
Scottish Miscellany |
On 12th April the big-end of ex L.N.E. 2493 (Glen Gloy) became unstuck at Alloa and the Perth-Glasgow train had to go forward behind J37 65320. Traffic delays held train back until it reached L.N.E. main line at Castlecary but there-after running was steady, with crew nursing the Alloa pilot all the way. A goodly number of ex L.M. class 5 engines are to be found working in the Fife area. Ex L.M. 4-6-0 45584 was noted working through Dunfermline. Ex C.R. 4-4-0 54499 is to be found regularly on 11.12 Stirling-Callarider turn. 54447 is still fitted with unlined, uncrested tender. The last B1 ex N.B.L. came out on 24th April. No. 61399 completes the order. The K1 class appear to be used solely on goods work on West Highland turns. On 4th May the Queen St.-Hamilton-Helensburgh-Milngavie Sunday trains re-commence with more local stations being opened. One of the 'Clan' class 4-6-2 engines appears frequently in St. Enoch Station on 12.20 ex Stranraer, returning there on 17.10 (17.15 SO) ex St. Enoch. |
SLS/195207 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 762 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
07/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9762 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5320 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65320 |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
30/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65320 from Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|