Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18825 Week
» 71841 Month
» 191368 Year
» 3218221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
775 |
m/e |
01/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9775 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5327 |
on |
22/03/1946 |
British Railways |
65327 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 01/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 13/11/1965 off Thornton Junction (62A) |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1922 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
03/1922 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
05/1943 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
05/1943 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
Awaiting shopping-44328, 64553, 64572 an 90455; shopped during last four weeks-44189, 64630, 65323/7; cut-up during last five weeks-55222/6/7/33, 56305, 57233/46/57, 57429, an 40619. Boilers and fireboxes in 'cemetery'-40574/94/603/18/9/50/63, 44319, 54491/3, 55198, 55207/8/15/6/22/6/7/30, 56305, 57257/349/429/552/4/85, 65246 an 68459. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 775 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1922 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9775 |
|
|
05/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
22/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5327 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65327 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65327 from Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
09/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|