Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1572 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14978 Week
» 67994 Month
» 187521 Year
» 3214374 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
782 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9782 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5334 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
British Railways |
65334 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 08/10/1962 off St Margarets (64A) |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1900 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
08/10/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
07/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
05/1945 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
05/1945 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/01/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Being Scrapped) |
Shopped: 42262/9, D361, D6142 an 61397. Scrapped: 69135/50, 69224. Being Scrapped: 65334, 68101. In Shops: 64592/7, D261/3. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 782 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9782 |
|
|
05/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5334 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65334 |
|
|
08/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65334 from St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|