Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 681 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14087 Week
» 67103 Month
» 186630 Year
» 3213483 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
783 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9783 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5335 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
65335 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 29/11/1963 off Grangemouth (65F) |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
PKD |
Parkhead |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
17/12/1960 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
09/06/1962 |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
6w/e |
18/08/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1922 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
09/1922 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
04/1946 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
04/1946 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 783 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1922 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1922 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
02/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9783 |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5335 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65335 |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
17/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
29/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65335 from Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|