Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 239 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 239 Week
» 30529 Month
» 333719 Year
» 1555284 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North British Railway 786 m/e 07/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 9786 m/e 09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5338 m/e 03/1946
British Railways 65338 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Holmes
Class J36
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3607/1900
J3611/1919
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 07/1900
Withdrawal Tue 24/12/1963 off Dunfermline Upper (62C)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 63 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1900
POL Polmont on 01/01/1948
64A St Margarets m/e 09/06/1956
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 26/10/1957
61C Keith 4w/e 11/04/1959
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 29/07/1961
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 19/01/1963
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 16/02/1963
   Withdrawn on 24/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 11/04/1959
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 29/07/1961
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 2w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 3w/e 25/01/1963
WDN   on 24/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1919 Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox)
11/1919 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
04/1947 Steam Brake fitted
04/1947 Westinghouse Brake removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/07/1961 Aberdeen Ferryhill MPD (Ex-Works) Ex-Works: 44281, 64576 an 65338. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1900 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 786
Built at Cowlairs Works
Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted
   
11/1919 Modification Diagram 81 boiler fitted    
11/1919 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9786    
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5338    
04/1947 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
04/1947 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65338    
09/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
26/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
29/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
16/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
24/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 65338 from Dunfermline Upper (62C)    

prev prev