Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3179 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16585 Week
» 69601 Month
» 189128 Year
» 3215981 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
787 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9787 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5339 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65339 |
m/e |
10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 08/03/1961 off Stockton (SKN) |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1900 |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/03/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/03/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
11/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1942 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
12/1942 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
Cowlairs Works |
The following locos. have recently been fitted with new Cowlairs boilers: Nos. 4499 (1932 of 4/44), 4589 (1885 of 11/41), 4594 (1934 of 5/44), 4599 (1929 of 4/44), 4609 (1951 of 12/44), 5221 (1920 of 12/43), 6329 (1926 of 1/44). All the foregoing are fitted with Pop safety valves and L.N.E.R. type fire doors. No. 4549 (1953 of 4/45) is fitted with a L.N.E. firedoor, and No. 7479 (1990 01/11/46) with a N.B. type firedoor. Nos. 5221, 5329 and 7479 have only one steam pipe in the smokebox, instead of the usual two. No. 4477 has been fitted with a Mark II. graduated brake, whist Nos. 5247 and 5339 have the Mark III. pattern. No. 4795 was fitted with American type injectors in July, 1946. |
SLS/194702 |
30/10/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. |
SLS/194712 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 787 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9787 |
|
|
1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5339 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
10/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65339 |
|
|
03/1961 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|
08/03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65339 from Stockton (SKN) |
|
|