Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2713 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16119 Week
» 69135 Month
» 188662 Year
» 3215515 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
788 |
m/e |
07/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9788 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5340 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65340 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 07/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/01/1952 off Hawick (64G) |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1900 |
HAW |
|
Hawick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/01/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/01/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
10/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
10/1944 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
10/1944 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/06/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 61502, 4484, 5232/57, 65281, 5307, 65340. ex L.M.S. No. 4251. |
SLS/194907 |
30/06/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Engines into shops: 5282, 5323, 61543, 61560, 62241, 62255, 64466, 64477, 64487, 65236, 65306, 65340, and (L.M.S) 14447, 17326, 44312, 57337. |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 788 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9788 |
|
|
10/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5340 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hawick (HAW) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65340 |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65340 from Hawick (64G) |
|
|
02/1952 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|