|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
08/02/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | In shops: 64610, D263; shopped in previous four weeks. 64592/7, D261, D2411. Scrapped between 21st January and 8th February: 57645, 64510/43/56, 65268, 68448/53/70. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1915 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 255 Built at Cowlairs Works |
||
11/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9255 | ||
12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4543 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64543 | ||
11/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
10/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64543 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |