|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1915 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 260 Built at Cowlairs Works |
||
09/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9260 | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4544 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG) | ||
05/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64544 | ||
06/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
21/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kipps (65E) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64544 from Kipps (65E) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge |