Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 543 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14586 Week
» 79540 Month
» 282204 Year
» 3309057 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
436 |
m/e |
06/1916 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9436 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4554 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64554 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J37 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 06/1916 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 23/01/1964 off Bathgate (64F) |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64C |
Dalry Road |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
5w/e |
03/02/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/01/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1916 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 436 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9436 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4554 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64554 |
|
|
27/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
23/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64554 from Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|