Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 305 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18108 Week
» 71124 Month
» 190651 Year
» 3217504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
161 |
m/e |
07/1918 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9161 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4563 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64563 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
2w/e |
12/01/1963 |
ALLOC |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
5w/e |
12/09/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/10/1964 |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
6w/e |
07/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1918 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 161 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21932 |
|
|
04/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9161 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4563 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64563 |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
19/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64563 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|