Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2715 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16121 Week
» 69137 Month
» 188664 Year
» 3215517 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
305 |
m/e |
08/1918 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9305 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4571 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
64571 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
5w/e |
13/06/1964 |
ALLOC |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
6w/e |
07/11/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1918 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 305 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21937 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9305 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4571 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64571 |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
23/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64571 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |
|
|