Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 341 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18144 Week
» 71160 Month
» 190687 Year
» 3217540 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
457 |
m/e |
09/1918 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9457 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4577 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64577 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/07/1952 |
BR Standard Clans |
The 'Clan' class engine is not appearing so regularly on the Stranraer road. Recently an ex-LM 5XP had to be assisted by ex-CR 18in. 0-6-0 from Girvan to Stranraer, the small engine doing most of the work, and ran almost to time. On 19/7 the 8.49 from Milngavie appeared for one day only in a new role. Made up of nine corridor vehicles hauled by 61067 (B1) it became a through train to London (K.X.). The S.O.C.T.A.C. special Craigendoran-Sheffield is worked by both B1 and ex-LM '5' 4-6-0 to Edinburgh. The Lauder branch is to be kept open meantime and class 2 2-6-0 engines are in use. Several lines are expecting the economy axe to fall shortly, both in Angus and the Coalbum and Strathaven branches in Lanarkshire. On 2/8 the 1.40 p.m. S.O. Glasgow to Largs, failed at Dalry. No. 40629 was taken from the train, which went forward half an hour late behind 90505. J37 64577 ran through the buffer stops at Leuchars on 29/7 and lay alongside the roadway until removed late that evening. Traffic working on the Ayr to Stranraer section during the summer has been fairly stereotyped. Trains to Girvan were worked by LM Compound, class 2 4-4-0, LM 2-6-4T and B.R. 2-6-4T (42206 and 80025 respectively), trains to Stranraer were generally hauled by ex-LM Class 5 4-6-0, with an occasional 5XP or Patriot, and a 'Clan' most days. There was one only ex-LM 2-6-0 seen on this section on goods work. Generally ex-LM 4-6-0 class 5 dealt with this traffic. Ex-CR 0-6-0T 56234 was pier pilot at Stranraer. 'Patriot' was always 45518 Bradshaw. |
SLS/195210 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1918 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 457 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21941 |
|
|
04/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9457 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4577 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64577 |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
17/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64577 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|