Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1141 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18944 Week
» 71960 Month
» 191487 Year
» 3218340 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
478 |
m/e |
01/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9478 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4592 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64592 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
POL |
Polmont |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
4w/e |
17/01/1959 |
ALLOC |
65K |
Polmont |
4w/e |
07/04/1962 |
ALLOC |
65F |
Grangemouth |
5w/e |
13/06/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
31/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/01/1963 |
Inverurie Works (In Shops) |
Shopped: 42262/9, D361, D6142 an 61397. Scrapped: 69135/50, 69224. Being Scrapped: 65334, 68101. In Shops: 64592/7, D261/3. |
SLS/196302 |
08/02/1963 |
Inverurie Works (shopped in previous four weeks) |
In shops: 64610, D263; shopped in previous four weeks. 64592/7, D261, D2411. Scrapped between 21st January and 8th February: 57645, 64510/43/56, 65268, 68448/53/70. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 478 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21956 |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9478 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4592 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmont (POL) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64592 |
|
|
17/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmont (65K) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
31/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64592 from Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|