Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2598 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16004 Week
» 69020 Month
» 188547 Year
» 3215400 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
471 |
m/e |
11/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9471 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4597 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64597 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/01/1963 |
Inverurie Works (In Shops) |
Shopped: 42262/9, D361, D6142 an 61397. Scrapped: 69135/50, 69224. Being Scrapped: 65334, 68101. In Shops: 64592/7, D261/3. |
SLS/196302 |
08/02/1963 |
Inverurie Works (shopped in previous four weeks) |
In shops: 64610, D263; shopped in previous four weeks. 64592/7, D261, D2411. Scrapped between 21st January and 8th February: 57645, 64510/43/56, 65268, 68448/53/70. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 471 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22269 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9471 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4597 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64597 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
11/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
06/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
22/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64597 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|