Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 482 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18285 Week
» 71301 Month
» 190828 Year
» 3217681 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
472 |
m/e |
11/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9472 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4598 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64598 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
on |
04/06/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/10/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. |
SLS/194712 |
15/10/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
In shops: 45461, 64595, 65910; waiting: 80093. Awaiting scrapping: 44008, 47168, 47536, 57331/378/613, 65313, 69204. Scrapped five weeks ended 12/10; 57445/671, 64598/607, 64604/30, 64480/637/794. |
SLS/196211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 472 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22270 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9472 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4598 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64598 |
|
|
04/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
06/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64598 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|