Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1973 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15379 Week
» 68395 Month
» 187922 Year
» 3214775 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
487 |
m/e |
11/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9487 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4602 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
64602 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1962 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped) |
In shops-44322/28, 45009, 64572, 64606, 65905. Awaiting shops: 65479. Shopped in previous five weeks-64552/91, 64602/27, 65297. Cut up previous five weeks- 55165/229, 57559, 61996/8, 64542/53, 65296, 68338. Being cut up: 40645/7, 57411, 57557, 64628. Awaiting cut up: 57560, 64566, 64963. 64553 was involved in an accident which resulted in a large 'tear' along the frame and although there was a possibility of repair it was scrapped in the shops. The battery rail-car is back in shops after further trials. |
SLS/196205 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 487 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22275 |
|
|
07/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9487 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4602 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64602 |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64602 from Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|