Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1509 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19312 Week
» 72328 Month
» 191855 Year
» 3218708 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
488 |
m/e |
11/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9488 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4603 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
64603 |
w/e |
25/11/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/01/1964 |
Bedford MPD (Scrapped) |
Since the change over from steam to diesel in August, 1963, this depot has had no regular allocation but from 18th January the official allocation (previously O/L) is D4135/6 an D5379/80/1/2/3. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
Shopped: 44722, 61147, 64558/99, 65931, D3548, D6139/53. Scrapped: 60089/98, 60159/62, 60804/38, 64603, 64579, 90058. In shops: 45011, 44880, 45194, 65915, D5328. Being Cut Up: 61177. |
SLS/196403 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 488 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22276 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9488 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4603 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64603 |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
16/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64603 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|