Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4194 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17600 Week
» 70616 Month
» 190143 Year
» 3216996 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
296 |
m/e |
12/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9296 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4605 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64605 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
Further locos. ex Cowlairs Works that have been noted here during November were: Nos. 1728/45, 1764/6 (green, with 1766 snowplough fitted), 2406/31/64/75, 4574, 4605/39, 4817, 4932, 5924, 7465, 8096, 8471, 8957, 9144/62/73. |
SLS/194801 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 296 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22490 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9296 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4605 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64605 |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
08/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64605 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
09/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|