Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1567 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19370 Week
» 72386 Month
» 191913 Year
» 3218766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
300 |
m/e |
12/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9300 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4606 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64606 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
5w/e |
07/03/1964 |
ALLOC |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
5w/e |
12/12/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/07/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1962 |
Inverurie Works (In shops) |
In shops-44322/28, 45009, 64572, 64606, 65905. Awaiting shops: 65479. Shopped in previous five weeks-64552/91, 64602/27, 65297. Cut up previous five weeks- 55165/229, 57559, 61996/8, 64542/53, 65296, 68338. Being cut up: 40645/7, 57411, 57557, 64628. Awaiting cut up: 57560, 64566, 64963. 64553 was involved in an accident which resulted in a large 'tear' along the frame and although there was a possibility of repair it was scrapped in the shops. The battery rail-car is back in shops after further trials. |
SLS/196205 |
12/07/1962 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped) |
In Shops: 42832, 55173, 57451, 64533/62, 64613/4/9, 65920. Awaiting Shops: 44016, D6142/4/7. Shopped during four weeks ending 30th June : 64537/47/79, 64606/25, 65297, 65319, D362, D2410, D5314, D6148/54, D8032. Condemned during four weeks ending 30th June: 40614, 55232, 64533/78, 65266/80, 65318/30, 69137. |
SLS/196208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 300 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22491 |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9300 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4606 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64606 |
|
|
29/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
14/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64606 from Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|