Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
401 |
m/e |
01/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9401 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4611 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64611 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 401 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22496 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9401 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4611 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64611 |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmont (65K) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64611 from Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
07/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|