|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/07/1961 | Inverurie Works (Waiting Works ) | Erecting Shops: D261, D2421, D3552, D6138/48, 43902, 44194, 44257, 64616/23, 65282, 65309/29. Waiting Works : 55185, 62479, 64494, 64612, 65261/81, 65900. Scrap Yard: 40574/94, 40688, 43868, 54475/83/8, 55198, 56240/6, 57232, 57324, 57552, 57609, 62474, 64471/82, 65276/95, 68459/71, 69136. | SLS/196108 |
28/08/1961 | Inverurie Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D2412, D3550, D3934, D5329, D6149/56, 44281/3, 45136, 64548/59/61/86, 64612, 65931. Test Line: 44315, 64539. Works Sidings: D2417, D3547/53, D8028, 44183. Dead Line: 43902, 57572, 62682, 64636. Scrap Yard-intact: 40603, 55126, Scrap Yard-remains only: 40574/94, 40604/11/88, 43922, 55198, 56376, 57552/4, 57609, 62479, 64482, 64576. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1920 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 402 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22497 |
||
04/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9402 | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4612 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
03/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64612 | ||
01/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carstairs (64D) | ||
12/05/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
27/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64612 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
01/1963 | Reinstated | Reinstated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge |