Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 2985 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16391 Week
» 69407 Month
» 188934 Year
» 3215787 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
491 |
m/e |
01/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9491 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4614 |
on |
10/02/1946 |
British Railways |
64614 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
5w/e |
07/03/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/12/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/07/1962 |
Inverurie Works (In Shops) |
In Shops: 42832, 55173, 57451, 64533/62, 64613/4/9, 65920. Awaiting Shops: 44016, D6142/4/7. Shopped during four weeks ending 30th June : 64537/47/79, 64606/25, 65297, 65319, D362, D2410, D5314, D6148/54, D8032. Condemned during four weeks ending 30th June: 40614, 55232, 64533/78, 65266/80, 65318/30, 69137. |
SLS/196208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 491 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22499 |
|
|
06/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9491 |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) |
|
|
10/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4614 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64614 |
|
|
29/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
17/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64614 from Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|