Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4189 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17595 Week
» 70611 Month
» 190138 Year
» 3216991 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
73 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9073 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4617 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
64617 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J37 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L739 |
Works Number |
22670 |
To Service |
During 12/1920 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 11/02/1963 off Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys |
Information |
Due to an acute shortage of motive power in the winter/spring of 1963, six J37s were reinstated as "on loan to operating stock" - this was one of them |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
REINS |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
3w/e |
25/01/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/02/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1947 |
Cowlairs Works |
On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. |
SLS/194710 |
24/08/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. |
SLS/194710 |
05/06/1949 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. |
SLS/194907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 73 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22670 |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9073 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4617 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64617 |
|
|
01/1963 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
11/02/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64617 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|