Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 551 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13957 Week
» 66973 Month
» 186500 Year
» 3213353 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
110 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9110 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4620 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
64620 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/09/1964 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped in 25 weeks ending 29th August) |
Shopped in 25 weeks ending 29th August: 44880, 44999, 45011, 45194, 64620, 65915, 76096, 76114, 80128, D3552, D3902, D5328, D6110/20/43/46, D8029/33/34. Scrapped 9th-28th March: 61117, 45465. no scrapping after that date. In Shops: 44956, 45016, 45213, 78054, D2414, D6116/17/19/38/41/52/55/56, D8576. Stored: 62712. In the above period there were unscheduled repairs on 13 steam locomotives and 70 diesel locomotives. The Clayton locomotives are being fitted with AWS, ten to date. (I regret the length of time which has elapsed between this and the last report but the epidemic prevented visits). |
SLS/196410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 110 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22673 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9110 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4620 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64620 |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64620 from Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|