|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
12/07/1962 | Inverurie Works (Shopped) | In Shops: 42832, 55173, 57451, 64533/62, 64613/4/9, 65920. Awaiting Shops: 44016, D6142/4/7. Shopped during four weeks ending 30th June : 64537/47/79, 64606/25, 65297, 65319, D362, D2410, D5314, D6148/54, D8032. Condemned during four weeks ending 30th June: 40614, 55232, 64533/78, 65266/80, 65318/30, 69137. | SLS/196208 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1921 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 273 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22678 |
||
03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9273 | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4625 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) | ||
04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64625 | ||
03/08/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) | ||
07/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
25/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
27/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
04/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64625 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |