|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
30/06/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. | SLS/195008 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1921 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 299 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22679 |
||
11/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9299 | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4626 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) | ||
11/06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64626 | ||
21/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ayr (67C) | ||
29/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64626 from Ayr (67C) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |