Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2971 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16377 Week
» 69393 Month
» 188920 Year
» 3215773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
33 |
m/e |
07/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9033 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4634 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64634 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J37 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 07/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 23/01/1964 off Bathgate (64F) |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64D |
Carstairs |
4w/e |
01/10/1955 |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/01/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1921 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 33 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9033 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4634 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64634 |
|
|
01/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carstairs (64D) |
|
|
12/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
23/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64634 from Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|