Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2310 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15716 Week
» 68732 Month
» 188259 Year
» 3215112 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
104 |
m/e |
08/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9104 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4635 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64635 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J37 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 08/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 off Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys |
Information |
Due to an acute shortage of motive power in the winter/spring of 1963, six J37s were reinstated as "on loan to operating stock" - this was one of them |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
REINS |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
3w/e |
25/01/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/04/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1921 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 104 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9104 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4635 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64635 |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64635 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
01/1963 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Inverkeithing |
|
|