Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1504 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14910 Week
» 67926 Month
» 187453 Year
» 3214306 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1404 |
on |
30/01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5903 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65903 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J38 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1303 |
To Service |
Sat 30/01/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/11/1966 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
4w/e |
11/02/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/11/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1946 |
Screw Reverse fitted |
11/1946 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/07/1961 |
Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) |
Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. |
SLS/196108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1404 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1303 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5903 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Screw Reverse fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65903 |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65903 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|