Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4297 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17703 Week
» 70719 Month
» 190246 Year
» 3217099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1407 |
on |
13/02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5906 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65906 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J38 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1306 |
To Service |
Fri 13/02/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/08/1965 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
4w/e |
06/05/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/08/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1947 |
Screw Reverse fitted |
07/1947 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/02/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1407 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1306 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5906 |
|
|
07/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Screw Reverse fitted |
|
|
07/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65906 |
|
|
06/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
06/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65906 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|