Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3860 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17266 Week
» 70282 Month
» 189809 Year
» 3216662 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1416 |
on |
18/03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5914 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65914 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J38 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1314 |
To Service |
Sat 18/03/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/11/1966 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
5w/e |
12/12/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/11/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1946 |
Screw Reverse fitted |
10/1946 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/03/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1416 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1314 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5914 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Screw Reverse fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65914 |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65914 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|