Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 644 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14050 Week
» 67066 Month
» 186593 Year
» 3213446 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1419 |
on |
13/03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5916 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65916 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J38 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1316 |
To Service |
Sat 13/03/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 30/10/1965 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1945 |
Screw Reverse fitted |
11/1945 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/04/1963 |
Eastfield MPD (ex Works) |
61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/03/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1419 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1316 |
|
|
11/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Screw Reverse fitted |
|
|
11/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5916 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65916 |
|
|
27/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
06/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65916 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|