25/02/1946 |
Detail Alterations |
B2 1671 has returned to Cambridge painted green, for Royal workings. 8783, one of the former Cambridge 'Royal' Clauds, has also been repainted green, and has been transferred to King's Lynn for working the Royal Train between there and Wolferton. Previously a black Lynn Claud, usually 8792, has been used on the Lynn-Wolferton part of the run. it is rumoured that a scheme is being prepared for altering the layout at King's Lynn by the completion of a triangle, which would enable Royal and other trains for the Hunstanton line to run through Lynn without reversing. 1671 is to be named 'Royal Sovereign,' a more appropriate name for its present duties than 'Manchester City.' N.B. locos recently fitted with graduated steam brake and vacuum in place of Westinghouse include 9380 an 9772. J38 1421/44 have had the steam reverse replaced by screw. |
SLS/194604 |
10/10/1963 |
Inverurie Works |
42737, 42909, 45475, 65918. In Scrap Yard: 60819/27, 64627, 65253/341. Shopped four weeks ended 4/10-44724, 45066, 80126, D6148/50, D8031; Scrapped same period-45049, 60851/959, 64568, 65316, 90193, 90536/42. |
SLS/196311 |
02/11/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped) |
Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. |
SLS/196402 |