|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/03/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1424 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1321 |
||
05/1945 | Modification | Modification: Screw Reverse fitted | ||
05/1945 | Modification | Modification: Steam Reverse Removed | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5921 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65921 | ||
28/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
04/12/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65921 | ||
06/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |