|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. | SLS/195008 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/04/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1440 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1327 |
||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5927 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) | ||
03/1948 | Modification | Modification: Screw Reverse fitted | ||
03/1948 | Modification | Modification: Steam Reverse Removed | ||
07/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65927 | ||
26/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
30/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65927 | ||
03/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |