25/02/1946 |
Detail Alterations |
B2 1671 has returned to Cambridge painted green, for Royal workings. 8783, one of the former Cambridge 'Royal' Clauds, has also been repainted green, and has been transferred to King's Lynn for working the Royal Train between there and Wolferton. Previously a black Lynn Claud, usually 8792, has been used on the Lynn-Wolferton part of the run. it is rumoured that a scheme is being prepared for altering the layout at King's Lynn by the completion of a triangle, which would enable Royal and other trains for the Hunstanton line to run through Lynn without reversing. 1671 is to be named 'Royal Sovereign,' a more appropriate name for its present duties than 'Manchester City.' N.B. locos recently fitted with graduated steam brake and vacuum in place of Westinghouse include 9380 an 9772. J38 1421/44 have had the steam reverse replaced by screw. |
SLS/194604 |
31/10/1949 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. |
SLS/194912 |
28/08/1961 |
Inverurie Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: D2412, D3550, D3934, D5329, D6149/56, 44281/3, 45136, 64548/59/61/86, 64612, 65931. Test Line: 44315, 64539. Works Sidings: D2417, D3547/53, D8028, 44183. Dead Line: 43902, 57572, 62682, 64636. Scrap Yard-intact: 40603, 55126, Scrap Yard-remains only: 40574/94, 40604/11/88, 43922, 55198, 56376, 57552/4, 57609, 62479, 64482, 64576. |
SLS/196110 |
18/01/1964 |
Bedford MPD (Shopped) |
Since the change over from steam to diesel in August, 1963, this depot has had no regular allocation but from 18th January the official allocation (previously O/L) is D4135/6 an D5379/80/1/2/3. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 |
Inverurie Works (Shopped) |
Shopped: 44722, 61147, 64558/99, 65931, D3548, D6139/53. Scrapped: 60089/98, 60159/62, 60804/38, 64603, 64579, 90058. In shops: 45011, 44880, 45194, 65915, D5328. Being Cut Up: 61177. |
SLS/196403 |