Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3477 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16883 Week
» 69899 Month
» 189426 Year
» 3216279 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1446 |
on |
25/05/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5933 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
65933 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J38 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1333 |
To Service |
Sat 25/05/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 17/04/1965 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
25/05/1926 |
DFU |
|
Dunfermline Upper |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/04/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1946 |
Screw Reverse fitted |
02/1946 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/06/1949 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. |
SLS/194907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/05/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1446 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1333 |
|
|
02/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Screw Reverse fitted |
|
|
02/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5933 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65933 |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65933 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|