|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 05/12/1928 | 30/01/1929 | 57 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/11/1930 | 23/12/1930 | 47 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/08/1931 | 18/08/1931 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/06/1932 | 20/06/1932 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1933 | 24/03/1933 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 97) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1935 | 26/02/1935 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1937 | 26/05/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2141 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1938 | 03/05/1938 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1939 | 04/09/1939 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1941 | 07/03/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number BP130 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/09/1943 | 13/10/1943 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 27548 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/02/1945 | 02/03/1945 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/12/1946 | 22/02/1947 | 58 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/10/1947 | 18/10/1947 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1949 | 03/09/1949 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27532 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64703 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/12/1951 | 09/02/1952 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/05/1955 | 22/06/1955 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2685 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/03/1959 | 17/04/1959 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/10/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. | SLS/194712 |
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/10/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1451 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1338 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
25/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
05/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1928. Dep: 30/01/1929. | ||
07/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1930. Dep: 23/12/1930. | ||
11/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1931. Dep: 18/08/1931. | ||
13/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1932. Dep: 20/06/1932. | ||
13/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1933. Dep: 24/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 97) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
17/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1935. Dep: 26/02/1935. | ||
21/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1937. Dep: 26/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2141 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
22/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1938. Dep: 03/05/1938. | ||
28/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1939. Dep: 04/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1941. Dep: 07/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP130 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1943. Dep: 13/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27548 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/02/1945. Dep: 02/03/1945. | ||
10/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4703 | ||
27/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1946. Dep: 22/02/1947. | ||
06/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/10/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947. | ||
07/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1949. Dep: 03/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27532 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64703 |
||
27/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/12/1951. Dep: 09/02/1952. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
07/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
12/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1955. Dep: 22/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2685 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/03/1959. Dep: 17/04/1959. | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
29/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64703 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |