Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1451 on 15/10/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4703 on 10/02/1946
British Railways 64703   03/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 15/10/1926 to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Withdrawal Thu 29/03/1962 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 02/1963
Service Life 35 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 15/10/1926
BLA Blaydon on 25/11/1927
53A Hull Dairycoates on 06/07/1952
52B Heaton on 07/12/1952
52G Sunderland on 13/12/1959
   Withdrawn on 29/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 29/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/10/1926 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1907)
24/03/1933 Westinghouse Brake removed
24/03/1933 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
24/03/1933 Steam Brake fitted
26/05/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2141)
26/05/1937 Steam Reverse Removed
26/05/1937 Screw Reverse fitted
04/09/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1922)
07/03/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number BP130)
13/10/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 4912)
03/09/1949 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number C1834)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 05/12/1928 30/01/1929 57 days General  
Gateshead Works 07/11/1930 23/12/1930 47 days General  
Gateshead Works 11/08/1931 18/08/1931 8 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 13/06/1932 20/06/1932 8 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/02/1933 24/03/1933 40 days General
Boiler number 1909 (Diagram 97)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 17/01/1935 26/02/1935 41 days General  
Darlington Works 21/04/1937 26/05/1937 36 days General
Boiler number 2141 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Darlington Works 22/03/1938 03/05/1938 43 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 28/07/1939 04/09/1939 39 days General
Boiler number 1922 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 04/02/1941 07/03/1941 32 days General
Boiler number BP130 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 23/09/1943 13/10/1943 21 days General
Boiler number 27548 (Diagram 97)
 
Gateshead Works 08/02/1945 02/03/1945 23 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 27/12/1946 22/02/1947 58 days General  
Cowlairs Works 06/10/1947 18/10/1947 13 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 07/07/1949 03/09/1949 59 days General
Boiler number 27532 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64703
 
Cowlairs Works 27/12/1951 09/02/1952 45 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 12/05/1955 22/06/1955 42 days General
Boiler number 2685 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 20/03/1959 17/04/1959 29 days Heavy Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/10/1947 Eastfield MPD Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. SLS/194712
27/08/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. SLS/194910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/10/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1451
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
25/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4703    
06/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
07/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
29/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64703 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev