Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 104 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4064 Week
» 33650 Month
» 407663 Year
» 1629228 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1456 on 28/10/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4707   23/06/1946
British Railways 64707   15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 28/10/1926 to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Withdrawal Fri 25/08/1961 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 09/1961
Service Life 34 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Inverurie

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) on 28/10/1926
DAR Darlington on 16/07/1934
BLA Blaydon on 03/08/1943
GHD Gateshead on 18/09/1949
54C Borough Gardens on 04/01/1953
52A Gateshead on 14/06/1959
52G Sunderland on 13/11/1960
   Withdrawn on 25/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GHD Gateshead w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 52A Gateshead on 14/06/1959
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 26/11/1960
WDN   on 25/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/10/1926 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
13/10/1931 Steam Brake fitted
13/10/1931 Westinghouse Brake removed
29/09/1933 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2306)
15/08/1935 Screw Reverse fitted
15/08/1935 Steam Reverse Removed
07/05/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 1907)
01/07/1941 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2710)
05/07/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2253)
26/05/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2713)
23/06/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27585)
01/12/1956 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27563)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 08/04/1929 28/05/1929 51 days General  
Darlington Works 31/08/1931 13/10/1931 44 days General
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 22/08/1933 29/09/1933 39 days General
Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 18/06/1935 15/08/1935 59 days General
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Darlington Works 09/04/1937 07/05/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 24/03/1939 10/05/1939 48 days General  
Darlington Works 26/05/1941 01/07/1941 37 days General
Boiler number 2710 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 08/03/1943 1 day W  
Darlington Works 03/06/1943 05/07/1943 33 days Heavy
Boiler number 2253 (Diagram 97)
 
Darlington Works 06/07/1943 14/07/1943 9 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 28/04/1945 26/05/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 2713 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 04/06/1947 18/06/1947 15 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 09/11/1947 25/01/1947 -287 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 09/04/1948 15/05/1948 37 days General
Renumbered to BR 64707
 
Cowlairs Works 24/05/1951 23/06/1951 31 days General
Boiler number 27585 (Diagram 97)
 
Gateshead Works 21/08/1951 24/08/1951 4 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 10/09/1953 09/10/1953 30 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 30/10/1956 01/12/1956 33 days General
Boiler number 27563 (Diagram 97)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/10/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1456
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
08/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1929. Dep: 28/05/1929.    
31/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1931. Dep: 13/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Steam Brake fitted
   
22/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1933. Dep: 29/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97)
   
16/07/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
18/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1935. Dep: 15/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Screw Reverse fitted
   
09/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1937. Dep: 07/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97)
   
24/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1939. Dep: 10/05/1939.    
26/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1941. Dep: 01/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2710 (Diagram 97)
   
08/03/1943 Works Visit      
03/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/06/1943. Dep: 05/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2253 (Diagram 97)
   
06/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1943. Dep: 14/07/1943.    
03/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
28/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2713 (Diagram 97)
   
23/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4707    
04/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/06/1947. Dep: 18/06/1947.    
09/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1947. Dep: 25/01/1947.    
09/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1948. Dep: 15/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 64707
   
18/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
24/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27585 (Diagram 97)
   
21/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1951. Dep: 24/08/1951.    
04/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
10/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/09/1953. Dep: 09/10/1953.    
30/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27563 (Diagram 97)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
13/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
25/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 64707 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev