|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 11/01/1929 | 06/03/1929 | 55 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/06/1931 | 12/08/1931 | 56 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1932 | 16/12/1932 | 36 days | Light Repair | Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1934 | 17/02/1934 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2310 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 8014 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1938 | 1 day | W | ||||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1939 | 16/02/1939 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2571 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1941 | 06/11/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/03/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 40 days | General | Boiler number C1719 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 44 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4710 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/12/1946 | 01/03/1947 | 65 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/09/1949 | 29/10/1949 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64710 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/04/1952 | 28/06/1952 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 27563 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/08/1956 | 04/10/1956 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27594 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/11/1956 | 16/11/1956 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
30/08/1961 | Cowlairs Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1459 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1345 Allocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
11/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1929. Dep: 06/03/1929. | ||
18/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1931. Dep: 12/08/1931. | ||
11/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/11/1932. Dep: 16/12/1932. Work undertaken: Steam Brakes fitted |
||
26/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1934. Dep: 17/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2310 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8014 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
28/07/1938 | Works Visit | |||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
10/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1939. Dep: 16/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2571 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1941. Dep: 06/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
08/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
21/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1719 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
22/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4710 |
||
27/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1946. Dep: 01/03/1947. | ||
13/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
19/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
27/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64710 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
03/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
11/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1952. Dep: 28/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27563 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1956. Dep: 04/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27594 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1956. Dep: 16/11/1956. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
17/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64710 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
09/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |