|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1929 | 08/03/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1931 | 31/12/1931 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1935 | 22/06/1935 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2291 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1936 | 23/01/1937 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1938 | 23/11/1938 | 28 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1940 | 22/06/1940 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1941 | 24/01/1942 | 98 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1943 | 12/02/1944 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/07/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 104 days | General | Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4712 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1948 | 22/12/1948 | 83 days | General | Boiler number BP140 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64712 |
||
Derby Works | 25/06/1951 | 24/08/1951 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 27672 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1953 | 16/01/1954 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 25807 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1954 | 28/01/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1954 | 09/02/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1956 | 17/11/1956 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27780 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1958 | 05/07/1958 | 39 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1951 | Derby Works | During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. | SLS/195109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/11/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1484 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1347 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
13/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
01/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1929. Dep: 08/03/1929. | ||
20/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
21/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
27/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1935. Dep: 22/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2291 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
29/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
30/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1936. Dep: 23/01/1937. | ||
27/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1938. Dep: 23/11/1938. | ||
29/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1940. Dep: 22/06/1940. | ||
19/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1941. Dep: 24/01/1942. | ||
21/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1943. Dep: 12/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4712 |
||
01/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1948. Dep: 22/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP140 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64712 |
||
25/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1951. Dep: 24/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27672 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25807 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1954. Dep: 28/01/1954. | ||
03/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/02/1954. Dep: 09/02/1954. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
26/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
07/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1956. Dep: 17/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27780 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958. | ||
09/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
01/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
04/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64712 from Colwick (40E) | ||
05/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |