|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
19/05/1927 | 15/07/1927 | 58 days | Light Repair | New pistons |
|||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1929 | 02/03/1929 | 45 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1931 | 27/06/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1934 | 23/06/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1935 | 25/05/1935 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 06/03/1937 | 27/03/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8011 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1939 | 27/05/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1941 | 12/07/1941 | 24 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/05/1943 | 05/06/1943 | 18 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 50 days | Heavy | Boiler number 2690 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1945 | 17/11/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1947 | 14/06/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1948 | 07/08/1948 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64713 |
||
Derby Works | 07/03/1951 | 30/04/1951 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 27804 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/12/1953 | 31/12/1953 | 31 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/05/1958 | 07/06/1958 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27453 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/03/1951 | Derby Works | Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3, 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. | SLS/195108 |
14/03/1951 | Derby Works | Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3: 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. | SLS/195104 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Awaiting Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1492 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1348 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
17/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929. | ||
30/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935. | ||
06/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1937. Dep: 27/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8011 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941. | ||
19/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943. | ||
07/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/08/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2690 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
15/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4713 | ||
31/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/05/1947. Dep: 14/06/1947. | ||
19/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1948. Dep: 07/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64713 |
||
07/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1951. Dep: 30/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27804 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
30/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
04/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
01/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 31/12/1953. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
01/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1958. Dep: 07/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27453 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
18/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64713 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
09/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |