Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 125 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4085 Week
» 33671 Month
» 407684 Year
» 1629249 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1492 on 02/12/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4713   15/06/1946
British Railways 64713   07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class J39
Company History LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Wed 02/12/1926 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Wed 18/04/1962 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 09/1962
Service Life 35 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham (New) on 02/12/1926
DON Doncaster on 28/02/1940
53A Hull Dairycoates on 02/09/1951
52C Blaydon on 30/11/1952
54C Borough Gardens on 04/01/1953
52B Heaton on 16/06/1957
52A Gateshead on 14/06/1959
52F Blyth (North) on 15/01/1961
52G Sunderland on 11/06/1961
   Withdrawn on 18/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 54C Borough Gardens 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 52A Gateshead on 14/06/1959
ALLOC 52FN   5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 5w/e 08/07/1961
WDN   on 18/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/12/1926 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 822)
27/06/1931 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8004)
23/06/1934 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8591)
27/03/1937 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8011)
27/05/1939 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8004)
25/09/1943 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 2690)
17/11/1945 Screw Reverse fitted
17/11/1945 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 8583)
17/11/1945 Steam Reverse Removed
07/08/1948 Diagram 97 boiler fitted
30/04/1951 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27804)
07/06/1958 Diagram 97 boiler fitted (number 27453)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 17/01/1929 02/03/1929 45 days General  
Gorton Works 30/05/1931 27/06/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1934 23/06/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1935 25/05/1935 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 06/03/1937 27/03/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 8011 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1939 27/05/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97)
 
Doncaster Works 19/06/1941 12/07/1941 24 days General  
Cowlairs Works 19/05/1943 05/06/1943 18 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/08/1943 25/09/1943 50 days Heavy
Boiler number 2690 (Diagram 97)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1945 17/11/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1947 14/06/1947 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 19/06/1948 07/08/1948 50 days General
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64713
 
Derby Works 07/03/1951 30/04/1951 55 days General
Boiler number 27804 (Diagram 97)
 
Cowlairs Works 01/12/1953 31/12/1953 31 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 01/05/1958 07/06/1958 38 days General
Boiler number 27453 (Diagram 97)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/03/1951 Derby Works Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3, 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. SLS/195108
14/03/1951 Derby Works Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3: 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/12/1926 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1492
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 97 boiler fitted
   
17/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929.    
30/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97)
   
02/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8591 (Diagram 97)
   
11/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935.    
06/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1937. Dep: 27/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8011 (Diagram 97)
   
06/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8004 (Diagram 97)
   
28/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
19/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941.    
19/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943.    
07/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/08/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2690 (Diagram 97)
   
13/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8583 (Diagram 97)
Screw Reverse fitted
   
15/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4713    
31/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/05/1947. Dep: 14/06/1947.    
19/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1948. Dep: 07/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 97)
Renumbered to BR 64713
   
07/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1951. Dep: 30/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27804 (Diagram 97)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
30/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
04/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C)    
01/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 31/12/1953.    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
01/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1958. Dep: 07/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27453 (Diagram 97)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
15/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
11/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
18/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64713 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev